EP4198213 - SANITARY FITTING WITH A MIXING CARTRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grohe AG 58675 Hemer / DE | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Voeller, Martin 58675 Hemer / DE | [2023/25] | Application number, filing date | 22207584.8 | 15.11.2022 | [2023/25] | Priority number, date | DE202110131208 | 29.11.2021 Original published format: DE102021131208 | [2023/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4198213 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4198213 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/04, F16J15/06 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
E03C1/04 (EP);
F16J15/062 (EP);
F16J15/106 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] |
Former [2023/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SANITÄRARMATUR MIT EINER MISCHKARTUSCHE | [2023/25] | English: | SANITARY FITTING WITH A MIXING CARTRIDGE | [2023/25] | French: | ROBINETTERIE SANITAIRE DOTÉE D'UNE CARTOUCHE DE MÉLANGE | [2023/25] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/02] | 07.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4682626 (BERGMANN KONRAD [DE]); | [A]DE10246861 (HDO DRUCKGUSS UND OBERFLAECHEN [DE]); | [A]EP1657366 (HANSA METALLWERKE AG [DE]) |