EP4372171 - A SHADING SYSTEM WITH ACTUATOR OVERLOAD PROTECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Helios Trading NV Nijverheidslaan 3 9880 Aalter / BE | [2024/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lebon, Jurgen 8650 Houthulst / BE | [2024/21] | Representative(s) | IP HILLS NV Bellevue 5/501 9050 Gent-Ledeberg / BE | [2024/21] | Application number, filing date | 22207809.9 | 16.11.2022 | [2024/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4372171 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E04B7/16 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
E04F10/00 (EP);
E04B7/163 (EP);
E04F10/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHATTUNGSSYSTEM MIT AKTUATORÜBERLASTSCHUTZ | [2024/21] | English: | A SHADING SYSTEM WITH ACTUATOR OVERLOAD PROTECTION | [2024/21] | French: | SYSTÈME D'OMBRAGE AVEC PROTECTION CONTRE LES SURCHARGES D'ACTIONNEUR | [2024/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3002555 (SIMON GOLDFARB) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE2623359 (HOKOSHO ELECTRIC COMM) [A] 1-15 * figure 14 *; | [A]JPS5831335U (UNSPECIFIED) [A] 1-15* figures 3,4 *; | [AD]EP3015618 (GIBUS SPA [IT]) [AD] 1-15 * figure 15 *; | [A]CN108487680 (SHAOXING KUAIQING TRADING CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 *; | [A]US10094122 (AKBULUT CEM [TR]) [A] 1-15 * figure 2 *; | [AD]EP3591136 (HELIOS TRADING NV [BE]) [AD] 1-15 * figures 1,4 *; | [A]WO2020074451 (TENDER SRL [IT]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,10,17 *; | [A]EP3859095 (WEINOR GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figure 5 *; | [A]EP3913161 (GIBUS SPA [IT]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,4 *; | [A]EP3913163 (GIBUS SPA [IT]) [A] 1-15 * figures 3,4 * | by applicant | EP3015618 | EP3591136 |