EP4186585 - DEVICE FOR DISPERSING WATER-SOLUBLE POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SNF Group ZAC de Milieux 42160 Andrézieux-Bouthéon / FR | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIVAS, Christophe 42160 ANDREZIEUX-BOUTHEON / FR | 02 /
BONNIER, Julien 42160 ANDREZIEUX-BOUTHEON / FR | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Laurent & Charras Le Contemporain 50 Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cedex / FR | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 22207942.8 | 17.11.2022 | [2023/22] | Priority number, date | FR20210012673 | 29.11.2021 Original published format: FR 2112673 | [2023/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4186585 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4186585 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B01F23/50, B01F23/53, B01F27/60, B01F27/271, B01F35/512 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
B01F23/53 (EP);
B01F23/56 (US);
B01F21/10 (US);
B01F23/54 (EP);
B01F25/80 (US);
B01F27/271 (EP);
B01F27/272 (US);
B01F27/62 (EP);
B01F33/83 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/36] |
Former [2023/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM DISPERGIEREN VON WASSERLÖSLICHEN POLYMEREN | [2023/22] | English: | DEVICE FOR DISPERSING WATER-SOLUBLE POLYMERS | [2023/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DISPERSION DE POLYMERES HYDROSOLUBLES | [2023/22] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/36] | 31.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 03.01.2024 | IS | 03.05.2024 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/27] | ES | 03.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4603156 (SORTWELL EDWIN T [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 1-7 * * column 3, line 50 - column 7, line 15 *; | [A]DE3730782 (KLOECKNER FERROMATIK DESMA) [A] 1-12 * figures 1,2 * * column 3, line 5 - line 20 ** column 4, lines 9-17 *; | [AD]WO2011107683 (SPCM SA [FR], et al) [AD] 1-12 * abstract * * page 8, line 24 - page 11, line 23 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2021140027 (CHO MYEONG-JIN [KR], et al) [A] 1-12 * figures 2,3 * * paragraphs [0047] - [0056] * | by applicant | WO2011107683 |