EP4186609 - FOLDING AND MEASURING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A FOLDING AND MEASURING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ebz Systec GmbH Bleicherstrasse 7 88212 Ravensburg / DE | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STADLER, Rainer 88605 Rast / DE | 02 /
KÜHNER, Benjamin 88484 Gutenzell / DE | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Großtobeler Straße 39 88276 Berg / Ravensburg / DE | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 22208529.2 | 21.11.2022 | [2023/22] | Priority number, date | DE202110130971 | 25.11.2021 Original published format: DE102021130971 | [2023/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4186609 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4186609 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B21D19/04, G01B11/02, G01B21/04, B21D39/02 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
G01B11/02 (EP);
B21D19/043 (EP);
B21D39/023 (EP);
G01B21/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/01] |
Former [2023/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FALZ- UND MESSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER FALZ- UND MESSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/22] | English: | FOLDING AND MEASURING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A FOLDING AND MEASURING DEVICE | [2023/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PLIAGE ET DE MESURE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN DISPOSITIF DE PLIAGE ET DE MESURE | [2023/22] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/01] | 29.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE202008003687U (KUKA SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]); | [AD]DE102009058817 (DAIMLER AG [DE]); | [YA]WO2011113928 (KUKA SYSTEMS GMBH [DE], et al); | [YA]DE202015100339U (KUKA SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | DE102009058817 |