EP4372773 - A METHOD FOR PRODUCING A TRANSFORMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Bruggerstrasse 66 5400 Baden / CH | [2024/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Banaszczyk, Jedrzej 32-020 Wieliczka / PL | 02 /
Michalik, Adam 32-087 Bibice / PL | 03 /
Rzepecki, Michal 30-650 Kraków / PL | [2024/21] | Representative(s) | Wroblewski, Marcin Jan Fert, Jakubiak vel Wojtczak Wróblewski rzecznicy patentowi Sp. P. / ul. Gdanska 126/A103 90-520 Lodz / PL | [2024/21] | Application number, filing date | 22208680.3 | 21.11.2022 | [2024/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4372773 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01F41/12, H01F27/32, H01B3/47 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
H01F41/127 (EP);
H01B3/40 (EP);
H01B3/46 (EP);
H01B3/47 (EP);
H01F27/327 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES TRANSFORMATORS | [2024/21] | English: | A METHOD FOR PRODUCING A TRANSFORMER | [2024/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN TRANSFORMATEUR | [2024/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5904984 (SMITH JAMES D B [US], et al); | [A]US2008251757 (YAMAMOTO HISANAO [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2017088932 (ABB SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) | by applicant | CN105047256 | WO2017012735 |