EP4375640 - METHOD FOR MONITORING AN LED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wagner Group GmbH Schleswigstrasse 1-5 30853 Langenhagen / DE | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Filippini, Daniel 30900 Wedemark / DE | 02 /
Hartwig, Daniel 30851 Langenhagen / DE | [2024/22] | Representative(s) | Götz, Gudrun Veronika Intellectual Property IP-Götz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Königstraße 70 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [2024/22] | Application number, filing date | 22208824.7 | 22.11.2022 | [2024/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4375640 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/06, G08B17/107, H05B45/10, H05B45/50 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
G01N15/06 (EP);
G01N15/0211 (EP);
G08B17/107 (EP);
G01N15/075 (EP);
G08B29/20 (EP);
H05B45/10 (EP);
H05B45/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINER LED | [2024/22] | English: | METHOD FOR MONITORING AN LED | [2024/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE D'UNE DEL | [2024/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDA]EP3029646 (SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) [XD] 10,12-16 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0064] * * figures 1, 2 *[A] 1-9,11; | [XDA]EP3131073 (SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) [XD] 10,12-16 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0048] * * figures 1-10 * [A] 1-9,11; | [XDA]EP3131077 (SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) [XD] 10,12-16 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0049] * * figures 1-8 * [A] 1-9,11 | by applicant | EP3029646 | EP3131073 | EP3131077 | GB2586283 | EP3985631 |