EP4375644 - FINGERPRINT ANALYSIS OF SINGLE MOLECULE EVENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gnothis Holding AG Riedstrasse 7 6330 Cham / CH | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDMAN, Lars 6330 Cham / CH | 02 /
LUNDBERG, Oscar 6330 Cham / CH | 03 /
REDIN, David 6330 Cham / CH | [2024/22] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2024/22] | Application number, filing date | 22208827.0 | 22.11.2022 | [2024/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4375644 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64, G01J3/44, // C12Q1/6869 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
G01N21/6428 (EP);
C12Q1/6869 (EP);
G01N21/6408 (EP);
G01N21/645 (EP);
G01J2003/104 (EP);
G01J2003/106 (EP);
G01J3/4406 (EP);
G01N2021/6419 (EP);
G01N2021/6421 (EP);
G01N21/6445 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2521/101, C12Q2521/543, C12Q2523/313, C12Q2563/103 (EP);
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2521/101, C12Q2521/543, C12Q2523/313, C12Q2563/107 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FINGERABDRUCKANALYSE VON EINZELMOLEKÜLEREIGNISSEN | [2024/22] | English: | FINGERPRINT ANALYSIS OF SINGLE MOLECULE EVENTS | [2024/22] | French: | ANALYSE D'EMPREINTES DIGITALES D'ÉVÉNEMENTS MOLÉCULAIRES UNIQUES | [2024/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004238756 (RIGLER RUDOLF [CH], et al); | [XI]US2016041095 (ROTHBERG JONATHAN M [US], et al); | [X]US2021124115 (SAXENA RAVI [US], et al); | [X]US2022243265 (ROTHBERG JONATHAN M [US], et al) | by applicant | EP0679251 | WO02097406 | WO03052137 | WO2006013110 | US7056661 | US7745116 | WO2013131888 | WO2015104245 | WO2017001407 | WO2018104301 |