EP4375140 - REAR LIGHT DEVICE OF A RACING CAR AND RELATED OPERATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marelli Automotive Lighting Italy S.p.A. Con Socio Unico Via Cavallo, 18 10078 Venaria Reale (TO) / IT | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IANNACONE, Federico 33028 Tolmezzo (UD) / IT | 02 /
MONTI, Desiree 33028 Tolmezzo (UD) / IT | 03 /
SACCÀ, Alessandro 33028 Tolmezzo (UD) / IT | [2024/22] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2024/22] | Studio Torta S.p.A. Viale Appiani, 26 31100 Treviso / IT | Application number, filing date | 22209027.6 | 23.11.2022 | [2024/22] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4375140 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/50, B60Q1/30, B60Q1/26, B60Q1/00, F21S43/15, F21S43/19, F21S43/31 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
B60Q1/5037 (EP);
B60Q1/0052 (EP);
B60Q1/2696 (EP);
B60Q1/30 (EP);
B60Q1/543 (EP);
B60Q1/545 (EP);
F21S43/14 (EP);
F21S43/15 (EP);
F21S43/19 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RÜCKLICHTVORRICHTUNG EINES RENNFAHRZEUGS UND ZUGEHÖRIGES BETRIEBSVERFAHREN | [2024/22] | English: | REAR LIGHT DEVICE OF A RACING CAR AND RELATED OPERATION METHOD | [2024/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FEU ARRIÈRE D'UN VÉHICULE DE COURSE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT ASSOCIÉ | [2024/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102011076330 (OSRAM AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,7,8,14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2013114280 (OH SE WOOK [KR]) [A] 1,11-13* figure 1 *; | [X]KR20140079932 (SL CORP [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7-9,11,12,14 * the whole document *; | [XA]US2016067597 (HAMILTON ANTHONY CARL [GB]) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,11,14,15 * the whole document * [A] 10,12; | [XA]US2017305332 (ALBOU PIERRE [FR], et al) [X] 1,3,5,7-10,14 * the whole document * [A] 11,13; | [X]JP2019001398 (KOITO MFG CO LTD) [X] 1,3,5,7,8,14 * the whole document *; | [X]JP2019034640 (KOITO MFG CO LTD) [X] 1,3,7,8,14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP3351850 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,11-13 * figures 23a, 23b *; | [X]US2022219601 (EGGENSPERGER MARTIN [DE], et al) [X] 1,7,8,14 * paragraph [0049] * * figures 1-4 * |