EP4160641 - DIRECT-CURRENT CIRCUIT BREAKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV, PL, PT | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INAGAKI, Takashi 100-8310 Tokyo / JP | 02 /
TOKOYODA, Sho 100-8310 Tokyo / JP | 03 /
KAMEI, Kenji 100-8310 Tokyo / JP | 04 /
KIMURA, Ryo 100-8310 Tokyo / JP | 05 /
MIYASHITA, Makoto 100-8310 Tokyo / JP | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 22209050.8 | 11.07.2017 | [2023/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4160641 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4160641 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01H33/59, // H01H9/54 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
H01H33/596 (EP,US);
H02H3/087 (US);
H01H2009/543 (EP);
H01H9/541 (EP);
Y02E60/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | GLEICHSTROM-LEISTUNGSSCHALTER | [2023/14] | English: | DIRECT-CURRENT CIRCUIT BREAKER | [2023/14] | French: | DISJONCTEUR À COURANT CONTINU | [2023/14] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 19.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17917537.7 / EP3654359 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 28.02.2024 | ES | 28.02.2024 | FI | 28.02.2024 | HR | 28.02.2024 | LT | 28.02.2024 | LV | 28.02.2024 | NL | 28.02.2024 | PL | 28.02.2024 | NO | 28.05.2024 | RS | 28.05.2024 | GR | 29.05.2024 | IS | 28.06.2024 | PT | 28.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/35] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 28.02.2024 | |
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 28.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2005190671 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-3 * paragraphs [0013] - [0020]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2016047209 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]WO2016056274 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A] - GELDER VAN P ET AL, "ZERO VOLT SWITCHING HYBRID DC CIRCUIT BREAKERS", CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE 2000 IEEE INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE. 35TH IAS ANNUAL MEETING AND WORLD CONFERENCE ON INDUSTRIAL APPLICATIONS OF ELECTRICAL ENERGY. ROME, ITALY, OCT. 8 - 12, 2000; [CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE IEEE INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS CO, (20001008), vol. CONF. 35, doi:10.1109/IAS.2000.882581, ISBN 978-0-7803-6402-8, pages 2923 - 2927, XP001042691 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IAS.2000.882581 | by applicant | JPS5834525 |