EP4161140 - METHODS, APPARATUS AND MACHINE-READABLE MEDIA RELATING TO WIRELESS TRANSMISSION IN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAX, Sebastian 50737 Cologne / DE | 02 /
LOPEZ, Miguel 170 69 Solna / SE | 03 /
SUNDMAN, Dennis 191 47 Sollentuna / SE | 04 /
WILHELMSSON, Leif 222 20 Lund / SE | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 22209188.6 | 24.04.2020 | [2023/14] | Priority number, date | US201962873344P | 12.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962873344 P | [2023/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4161140 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/06, H04W74/08 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
H04W74/08 (EP,KR);
H04W74/085 (US);
H04L1/0003 (US);
H04L1/1867 (EP,KR);
H04L27/2602 (KR);
H04L27/2613 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (US);
H04W28/06 (EP);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W74/004 (KR);
H04W74/0808 (US);
H04W74/0833 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND MASCHINENLESBARE MEDIEN FÜR DIE DRAHTLOSE ÜBERTRAGUNG IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK | [2023/14] | English: | METHODS, APPARATUS AND MACHINE-READABLE MEDIA RELATING TO WIRELESS TRANSMISSION IN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK | [2023/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, APPAREILS ET SUPPORTS LISIBLES PAR MACHINE SE RAPPORTANT À UNE TRANSMISSION SANS FIL DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION | [2023/14] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 18.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20722534.3 / EP3997906 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005039105 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 11 * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0103] * * paragraph [0110] * * paragraph [0119] - paragraph [0120] ** paragraph [0122] - paragraph [0123] * |