EP4187050 - FASTENING DEVICE FOR A BUILDING CLOSURE DEVICE, METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE FASTENING DEVICE, AND BUILDING CLOSURE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 01.12.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] | 01.12.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roto Frank Fenster- und Türtechnologie GmbH Wilhelm-Frank-Platz 1 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Unseld, Nils 71088 Holzgerlingen / DE | 02 /
Gonser, Manuel 73230 Kirchheim unter Teck / DE | 03 /
Altweger, Tobias 71093 Weil im Schönbuch / DE | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | Dietz, Christopher Friedrich, et al Gleiss Große Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstraße 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 22209351.0 | 24.11.2022 | [2023/22] | Priority number, date | DE202110213287 | 25.11.2021 Original published format: DE102021213287 | [2023/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4187050 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E05D5/02, E05D7/04, E05D15/52 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
E05D5/0238 (EP);
E05D15/52 (EP);
E05D7/0423 (EP);
E05Y2600/12 (EP);
E05Y2600/14 (EP);
E05Y2600/31 (EP);
E05Y2600/502 (EP);
E05Y2600/528 (EP);
E05Y2600/53 (EP);
E05Y2600/56 (EP);
E05Y2600/624 (EP);
E05Y2600/626 (EP);
E05Y2600/63 (EP);
E05Y2600/632 (EP);
E05Y2800/172 (EP);
E05Y2900/148 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/01] |
Former [2023/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEFESTIGUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINE GEBÄUDEVERSCHLUSSEINRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN DER BEFESTIGUNGSEINRICHTUNG SOWIE GEBÄUDEVERSCHLUSSEINRICHTUNG | [2023/22] | English: | FASTENING DEVICE FOR A BUILDING CLOSURE DEVICE, METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE FASTENING DEVICE, AND BUILDING CLOSURE DEVICE | [2023/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION POUR UN DISPOSITIF DE FERMETURE DE BÂTIMENT, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DU DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION AINSI QUE DISPOSITIF DE FERMETURE DE BÂTIMENT | [2023/22] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/01] | 28.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0538586 (SCHLECHTENDAHL & SOEHNE WILH [DE]) [X] 1-4,7-10,12-15 * column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 24; figures 1-9 *[I] 5,6,11; | [XI]DE19522222 (ROTO FRANK AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,7-10,12-15 * column 4, line 64 - column 7, line 26; figures 1-5 * [I] 5,6,11; | [XI]EP0977930 (FERCO INT USINE FERRURES [FR]) [X] 1,2,7,10,12-15 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1-9 * [I] 11; | [XI]EP3274535 (GIESSE SPA [IT]) [X] 1,3,7,11,12,15 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0092]; figures 14-17 * [I] 4-6 | by applicant | DE8701261U |