EP4190563 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A MARK ON A PACKAGING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 15.12.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | 15.12.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance S.A. Avenue Général-Guisan 70 1009 Pully / CH | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHOURVARZI, Keyvan 221 86 Lund / SE | 02 /
NYBORG, Stefan 221 86 Lund / SE | 03 /
ALDENIUS, Maria 221 86 Lund / SE | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Tetra Pak - Patent Attorneys SE AB Tetra Pak Patent Department Ruben Rausings gata 221 86 Lund / SE | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 22209414.6 | 24.11.2022 | [2023/23] | Priority number, date | EP20210212336 | 03.12.2021 Original published format: EP 21212336 | [2023/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4190563 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B41F33/00, B65B41/18, B65B61/02 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
B41F33/0081 (EP);
B41F5/24 (EP);
B41P2233/50 (EP);
B41P2233/52 (EP);
B65B61/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] |
Former [2023/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MARKIERUNG AUF EINEM VERPACKUNGSMATERIAL | [2023/23] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A MARK ON A PACKAGING MATERIAL | [2023/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE MARQUE SUR UN MATÉRIAU D'EMBALLAGE | [2023/23] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/03] | 07.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3452374 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 ** paragraphs [0008] - [0027] *; | [XA]US2021292027 (BERGHOLTZ LARS [SE], et al) [X] 11-15 * figures 1,3,5,7 * * paragraphs [0043] - [0081] * [A] 1-10 |