EP4376019 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ASSISTING INDIVIDUALS TO ACCESS EYE HEALTH EXAMINATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ocumeda AG Obere Mühle 8 8586 Riedt bei Erlen / CH | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kirr, Jörg-Christian 4588 Unterramsern / CH | 02 /
Haarburger, Christoph 81927 München / DE | 03 /
Wiechers, Benedikt 80634 München / DE | [2024/22] | Representative(s) | BOVARD AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3013 Bern / CH | [2024/22] | Application number, filing date | 22209742.0 | 25.11.2022 | [2024/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4376019 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G16H40/63, G16H50/20 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
G16H50/20 (EP);
G16H80/00 (EP,US);
G16H10/60 (US);
G16H15/00 (US);
G16H40/63 (EP);
G16H40/67 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG VON PERSONEN FÜR DEN ZUGANG ZU AUGENGESUNDHEITSUNTERSUCHUNGEN | [2024/22] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ASSISTING INDIVIDUALS TO ACCESS EYE HEALTH EXAMINATIONS | [2024/22] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR AIDER DES INDIVIDUS À ACCÉDER À DES EXAMENS DE SANTÉ DE L' IL | [2024/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2021251482 (SERIANI JOSEPH S [US]) |