EP4198260 - SCREW SPINDLE PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leistritz Pumpen GmbH Markgrafenstraße 36-39 90459 Nürnberg / DE | [2024/20] |
Former [2023/25] | For all designated states Leistritz Pumpen GmbH Markgrafenstraße 29-39 90459 Nürnberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
METZ, Herr Jürgen 90537 Feucht / DE | 02 /
Popp, Florian 90443 Nürnberg / DE | 03 /
LISSEK, Kristin 90763 Fürth / DE | [2023/25] | Representative(s) | Lindner Blaumeier Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Dr. Kurt-Schumacher-Str. 23 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [2023/25] | Application number, filing date | 22209990.5 | 28.11.2022 | [2023/25] | Priority number, date | DE202110133109 | 14.12.2021 Original published format: DE102021133109 | [2023/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4198260 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4198260 | Date: | 31.07.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F01C1/16, F04C2/16 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
F04C2/16 (EP,KR,US);
F04C2/107 (CN);
F01C1/16 (EP);
F04C15/00 (CN);
F04C15/008 (KR);
F04C15/06 (CN,KR,US);
B60H1/00278 (US);
F04C2240/10 (KR);
F04C2240/20 (KR);
F04C2240/30 (CN,KR,US);
F04C2240/40 (KR);
F04C2240/50 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/49] |
Former [2023/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHRAUBENSPINDELPUMPE | [2023/25] | English: | SCREW SPINDLE PUMP | [2023/25] | French: | POMPE À VIS | [2023/25] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/49] | 30.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB263540 (MAVOR & COULSON LTD, et al); | [A]DE2621303 (MAEKAWA SEISAKUSHO KK); | [AD]DE102018131587 (NIDEC GPM GMBH [DE]); | [A]US2021164468 (DEICHMANN JOHANNES [DE], et al) | by applicant | DE102018131587 |