EP4207288 - DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Choi, Yoon Sun Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 1603-1103 / KR | 02 /
Cho, Seung Hwan Suji-gu, Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 432-1601 / KR | 03 /
Choi, Won Suk Songpa-gu, Seoul 3-102 / KR | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2023/27] | Application number, filing date | 22210150.3 | 29.11.2022 | [2023/27] | Priority number, date | KR20210176173 | 10.12.2021 Original published format: KR 20210176173 | [2023/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4207288 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4207288 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/12, G02F1/1362, G09G3/3225, H10K59/131, G09G3/3258, G09G3/3233 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
G09G3/3233 (EP);
H10K59/131 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/124 (EP,CN);
H10K59/00 (EP);
H10K59/121 (EP,KR);
G09G2300/0413 (EP);
G09G2300/0426 (EP);
G09G2300/0819 (EP);
G09G2300/0861 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] |
Former [2023/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2023/27] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE | [2023/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2023/27] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 22.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3817064 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0033] *; | [A]EP3876282 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-9 * abstract ** paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0024] *; | [A]EP3916795 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0033] * |