EP4379549 - METHOD FOR PROVIDING A COMMUNICATION AND COMPUTING SERVICE SESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | 03.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 03.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2024/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERKILIC CIVELEK, Tugce 80687 Munich / DE | 02 /
GUERZONI, Riccardo 80687 Munich / DE | 03 /
SAMA, Malla Reddy 80687 Munich / DE | [2024/23] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2024/23] | Application number, filing date | 22210814.4 | 01.12.2022 | [2024/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4379549 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
G06F9/5094 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINER KOMMUNIKATIONS- UND RECHNERDIENSTSITZUNG | [2024/23] | English: | METHOD FOR PROVIDING A COMMUNICATION AND COMPUTING SERVICE SESSION | [2024/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR FOURNIR UNE SESSION DE COMMUNICATION ET DE SERVICE INFORMATIQUE | [2024/23] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/23] | 07.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2012246214 (OGAWA YUKIO [JP], et al); | [A]US10419283 (FONTANEZ JONATHAN [US]); | [Y]CN110287034 (UNIV CHONGQING) |