EP4266583 - PHASE LOCKED LOOP CIRCUIT, ELECTRONIC CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 12.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | 12.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | 12.04.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG Mühldorfstrasse 15 81671 München / DE | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEEGER, Julius 83209 Prien am Chiemsee / DE | 02 /
HELD, Werner 94060 Pocking / DE | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2023/43] | Application number, filing date | 22211036.3 | 02.12.2022 | [2023/43] | Priority number, date | CN202210431138 | 22.04.2022 Original published format: CN202210431138 | [2023/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4266583 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H03L7/093, H03L7/107 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
H03L7/093 (EP,CN);
H03L7/099 (CN);
H03L7/1075 (EP);
H03L7/18 (CN);
H03L2207/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] |
Former [2023/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHASENREGELKREISSCHALTUNG, ELEKTRONISCHE SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/43] | English: | PHASE LOCKED LOOP CIRCUIT, ELECTRONIC CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS | [2023/43] | French: | CIRCUIT À BOUCLE À VERROUILLAGE DE PHASE, AGENCEMENT DE CIRCUIT ÉLECTRONIQUE ET APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/43] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2024 | Examination requested [2024/20] | 11.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6054903 (FIEDLER ALAN S [US]) [A] 1-15* column 1 - column 8; figures 1-10 *; | [XAI]US2001013812 (CUNNING MICHAEL D [US]) [X] 1-4,6,7,10,11 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0025]; figures 1-3 * [A] 8,9 [I] 5,12-15; | [XI]US2007018735 (SIRITO-OLIVIER PHILIPPE [FR]) [X] 1-4,6-9,12 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0035]; figures 1-7 * [I] 5,10,11,13-15; | [XAI]US2012170699 (FISCHETTE DENNIS M [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,10-13 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0047]; figures 1-5 * [A] 8,9 [I] 5,14,15; | [XI]US8264258 (CHEN CHIH-HUNG [TW]) [X] 1-4,6-12 * column 1 - column 7; figures 1-5 * [I] 5,13-15; | [XAI]US2015061737 (ABBASI SAEED [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,10,12,13 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0054]; figures 1-4 * [A] 9,11 [I] 5,14,15 | by applicant | US8274317 |