EP4194247 - ELECTRIC COMMERCIAL VEHICLE COMPRISING AN IMPACT DEVICE SAFETY ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 13.10.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] | 13.10.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAF Trucks N.V. Hugo van der Goeslaan 1 5643 TW Eindhoven / NL | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROEDERS, Johannes Baptist Wilhelmus Bernardus@Maria 5643 TW Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
KESSELS, Johannes Theodorus Bernard Anna 5643 TW Eindhoven / NL | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 22211726.9 | 06.12.2022 | [2023/24] | Priority number, date | NL20212030055 | 07.12.2021 Original published format: NL 2030055 | [2023/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4194247 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60L3/04, B60L3/00, B62D21/15, B62D33/077 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
B60L3/04 (EP);
B60L3/0007 (EP);
B62D21/15 (EP);
B62D33/0604 (EP);
B60L2200/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/46] |
Former [2023/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES NUTZFAHRZEUG MIT EINER AUFPRALLSICHERHEITSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/24] | English: | ELECTRIC COMMERCIAL VEHICLE COMPRISING AN IMPACT DEVICE SAFETY ARRANGEMENT | [2023/24] | French: | VÉHICULE UTILITAIRE ELECTRIQUE DOTÉ D'UN DISPOSITIF DE SECURITE COLLISION | [2023/24] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/46] | 09.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102004059947 (KS ENGINEERING GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11* abstract *; | [A]DE102010050347 (SEW EURODRIVE GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0060]; figure 2 *; | [A]WO2019219179 (EDAG ENG GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]WO2021045668 (SCANIA CV AB [SE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * |