Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
10.05.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
10.05.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
08.05.2024 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | |
10.03.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
26.01.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
26.01.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
26.01.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
16.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
16.06.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |