EP4205623 - DISHWASHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.09.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul, 07336 / KR | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jongyoung 08592 Geumcheon-gu, Seoul / KR | 02 /
LEE, Dongho 08592 Geumcheon-gu, Seoul / KR | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/27] | Application number, filing date | 22212213.7 | 08.12.2022 | [2023/27] | Priority number, date | KR20210194339 | 31.12.2021 Original published format: KR 20210194339 | KR20210194341 | 31.12.2021 Original published format: KR 20210194341 | KR20210194340 | 31.12.2021 Original published format: KR 20210194340 | KR20210194343 | 31.12.2021 Original published format: KR 20210194343 | [2023/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4205623 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/48 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
A47L15/486 (EP,US);
A47L15/4223 (US);
A47L15/48 (EP);
F24H3/022 (US);
A47L15/4287 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/49] |
Former [2023/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESCHIRRSPÜLMASCHINE | [2023/27] | English: | DISHWASHER | [2023/27] | French: | LAVE-VAISSELLE | [2023/27] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/49] | 31.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009008828 (ASKO CYLINDA AB [SE], et al); | [A]WO2009028803 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al); | [AD]EP3000377 (INDESIT CO SPA [IT]); | [A]WO2019015284 (FOSHAN SHUNDE MIDEA WASHING APPLIANCES MFG CO LTD [CN], et al) | by applicant | DE102012203320 | EP3000377 |