EP4383386 - BATTERY CELL WITH IMPROVED HEAT TRANSFER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLVO TRUCK CORPORATION 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [2024/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AHMED, Istaq 422 44 Göteborg / SE | 02 /
HAMRIN, Alice 417 06 Göteborg / SE | 03 /
TINTIGNAC, Sophie 418 71 Göteborg / SE | 04 /
MCCARTHY, Benjamin 439 55 Åsa / SE | 05 /
CHOI, Youngjin 421 73 Västra Frölunda / SE | 06 /
SHAWN, Soran 431 33 Mölndal / SE | [2024/24] | Representative(s) | Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [2024/24] | Application number, filing date | 22212540.3 | 09.12.2022 | [2024/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4383386 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/04, H01M10/0587, H01M10/613, H01M10/65, H01M50/545 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
H01M50/103 (EP);
H01M50/179 (CN);
H01M10/653 (EP,US);
H01M10/0431 (EP);
H01M10/0587 (EP,US);
H01M10/613 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/625 (CN);
H01M10/643 (EP,US);
H01M10/654 (EP);
H01M4/13 (US);
H01M50/528 (US);
H01M50/533 (US);
H01M50/545 (EP);
H01M2004/027 (US);
H01M2220/20 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIEZELLE MIT VERBESSERTER WÄRMEÜBERTRAGUNG | [2024/24] | English: | BATTERY CELL WITH IMPROVED HEAT TRANSFER | [2024/24] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE BATTERIE À TRANSFERT DE CHALEUR AMÉLIORÉ | [2024/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001068145 (TOSHIBA BATTERY); | [X]US7108942 (GAN HONG [US], et al); | [X]WO2012042830 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al); | [X]WO2022044936 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) |