EP4215777 - OPTIMIZED MASS CAST BAR PIN FOR BUSHING ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Pullman Company 33 Lockwood Road Milan, OH 44846 / US | [2023/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CERRI, III, Joseph F. Milan, 44846 / US | 02 /
GASPAR, Zoren E. Milan, 44846 / US | [2023/30] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [2023/30] | Application number, filing date | 22212784.7 | 12.12.2022 | [2023/30] | Priority number, date | US202117557582 | 21.12.2021 Original published format: US202117557582 | [2023/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4215777 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4215777 | Date: | 14.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F16F1/38 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
F16F1/3863 (EP,CN,US);
F16F1/3842 (CN);
B60G2204/41 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] | Title | German: | GUSSSTANGENSTIFT MIT OPTIMIERTER MASSE FÜR BUCHSENANORDNUNG | [2023/30] | English: | OPTIMIZED MASS CAST BAR PIN FOR BUSHING ASSEMBLY | [2023/30] | French: | BROCHE DE BARRE COULÉE EN MASSE OPTIMISÉE POUR ENSEMBLE DE DOUILLE | [2023/30] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/30] | 25.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004055406 (ZF LEMFOERDER METALLWAREN AG [DE], et al); | [A]US2009060640 (VOGLER RICHARD GREGORY [US], et al); | [A]DE102014223534 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]); | [A]US2018112733 (KONDOR JOZSEF [DE], et al) |