EP4166587 - ISOCYANATE-MODIFIED POLYESTER-EPOXIDE POLYMER COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stepan Company 22 West Frontage Road Northfield, Illinois 60093 / US | [2023/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAPLAN, Warren A. Libertyville, IL, 60048 / US | 02 /
WESTFALL, Jennifer S. Bethel Park, IL, 15102 / US | [2023/16] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [2023/16] | Application number, filing date | 22212857.1 | 08.08.2017 | [2023/16] | Priority number, date | US201762466034P | 02.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762466034 P | [2023/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4166587 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/00, C08G18/42, C08G18/18, C09D175/06, C08L75/06, C09J175/06, C08G18/76, C08G18/58 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
C08G18/4211 (EP,KR);
C08G18/58 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/4252 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/003 (EP,KR);
C08G18/166 (US);
C08G18/1825 (EP,KR);
C08G18/222 (KR);
C08G18/4216 (EP,KR);
C08G18/4219 (EP,KR);
C08G18/4238 (EP,KR);
C08G18/76 (US);
C08G18/7664 (EP,KR);
C08L75/04 (US);
C09D175/06 (EP,KR);
C09D175/08 (US);
C09J175/06 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] |
Former [2023/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ISOCYANAT-MODIFIZIERTE POLYESTER-EPOXIDE POLYMER ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2023/16] | English: | ISOCYANATE-MODIFIED POLYESTER-EPOXIDE POLYMER COMPOSITIONS | [2023/16] | French: | COMPOSITIONS POLYMÈRE DE POLYESTERÉPOXYDE MODIFIÉ PAR ISOCYANATES | [2023/16] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/40] | 25.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17754568.8 / EP3589669 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1512705 (C O I M S P A CHIMICA ORGANICA [IT]); | [A]US2010126664 (O'BRIEN MICHAEL E [US]); | [I]US2011288204 (GRABLOWITZ HANS GEORG [DE], et al) | by applicant | JPS6448928 | JPH0364529B | KR100726684B | CN101358122 | RU2457220 | WO2014072515 | CN104212405 | CN104745138 |