EP4238710 - ROBOTIC SYSTEM FOR ALUMINUM FURNACE OPERATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dynamic Concept 2400 rue Alexis-le-Trotteur Saguenay, Québec G7X 0J7 / CA | [2023/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CÔTÉ, Patrice Jonquière, G7X 0H9 / CA | 02 /
DESMEULES, Jean-François Jonquière, G7S 2L4 / CA | 03 /
MENARD, Cedrik Saguenay, G7H 7N4 / CA | [2023/36] | Representative(s) | Jacob, Reuben Ellis, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2023/36] | Application number, filing date | 22213226.8 | 13.12.2022 | [2023/36] | Priority number, date | US202263315819P | 02.03.2022 Original published format: US 202263315819 P | [2023/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4238710 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B25J5/00, B25J9/04, B25J9/06 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
B25J9/042 (EP);
B25J5/00 (EP);
B25J9/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] |
Former [2023/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROBOTERSYSTEM FÜR ALUMINIUMOFENOPERATIONEN | [2023/36] | English: | ROBOTIC SYSTEM FOR ALUMINUM FURNACE OPERATIONS | [2023/36] | French: | SYSTÈME ROBOTIQUE POUR OPÉRATIONS DE FOUR À ALUMINIUM | [2023/36] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/15] | 06.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4568238 (HIRANO YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US5634377 (KIMURA AKIRA [JP], et al); | [A]US10751888 (BIDRAM FARHANG [CA], et al); | [A]WO2021086745 (LAM RES CORP [US]) |