EP4223916 - ROLLER AND NONWOVEN INLAY AND CARD WITH SUCH A ROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 02.02.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | 02.02.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oskar Dilo Maschinenfabrik KG Im Hohenend 11 69412 Eberbach / DE | [2023/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DILO, Johann Philipp Eberbach / DE | [2023/32] | Representative(s) | Wächter, Jochen, et al Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | [2023/32] | Application number, filing date | 22213472.8 | 14.12.2022 | [2023/32] | Priority number, date | EP20220155418 | 07.02.2022 Original published format: EP 22155418 | [2023/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4223916 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | D01G15/14, B65H27/00, D01G25/00, F16C13/00 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
D01G15/14 (EP);
D04H1/70 (CN);
D01G15/18 (US);
B65H27/00 (EP,US);
D01G15/04 (US);
D01G15/12 (CN);
D01G25/00 (EP);
D04H1/74 (US);
D04H18/02 (CN);
F16C13/00 (EP);
F16C13/006 (CN);
B65H2401/112 (US);
B65H2404/10 (US);
B65H2404/551 (US);
F16C2240/26 (EP);
F16C2326/58 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] |
Former [2023/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WALZE SOWIE VLIESLEGER UND KREMPEL MIT EINER SOLCHEN WALZE | [2023/32] | English: | ROLLER AND NONWOVEN INLAY AND CARD WITH SUCH A ROLLER | [2023/32] | French: | ROULEAU ET ÉTALEUR-NAPPEUR ET CARDEUSE AVEC UN TEL ROULEAU | [2023/32] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/10] | 29.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP0736369 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,9,13 * column 7, line 52 - column 7, line 54; figure 2 * * column 10, line 36 - column 11, line 9; example 2; claim 3 * * column 13, line 35 - column 13, line 57; example 5 * * column 14, line 1 - column 14, line 26 * [A] 4-8,10-12 [I] 3,14,15; | [A]US5836500 (JOURDE BERNARD [FR]) [A] 1-15* column 2, line 33 - column 2, line 60; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0894876 (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]) [A] 1-15 * figure 5; claim 1 *; | [A]DE102004035770 (TRUETZSCHLER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0008] , [00 9] , [0 24]; figure 3; claims 6, 8 *; | [XAI]EP1927771 (YUGEN KAISHA HAMA INT [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,9,12 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0062]; figures 1, 2A, 2B * [A] 4,7,10,11 [I] 3,6,8,13; | [A]JP6944142B (SANWA TECHNO KK; RISETEC CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0058]; figures 1-3; example 1; claim 1 * |