Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
27.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.10.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
27.10.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
27.10.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
24.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
01.04.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.03.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] |
27.12.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.12.2022 | Change - representative |