EP4386415 - METHOD FOR ACQUIRING A MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGE DATASET AND GENERATING A MOTION-CORRECTED IMAGE DATASET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Change - representative | 17.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Healthineers AG Siemensstraße 3 91301 Forchheim / DE | For all designated states The General Hospital Corporation 55 Fruit Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | [2024/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Polak, Daniel 91052 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Cauley, Stephen Farman Winchester, 01890 / US | 03 /
Splitthoff, Daniel Nicolas 91080 Uttenreuth / DE | [2024/25] | Representative(s) | Siemens Healthineers Patent Attorneys, et al Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2024/25] | Application number, filing date | 22213936.2 | 15.12.2022 | [2024/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4386415 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/565, G01R33/561, // G01R33/48, G01R33/56 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
G01R33/56509 (EP,US);
G01R33/4818 (US);
G01R33/385 (US);
G01R33/5616 (EP);
G01R33/5617 (EP);
G01R33/482 (EP);
G01R33/4822 (EP);
G01R33/4824 (EP);
G01R33/5602 (EP);
G01R33/5611 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERFASSUNG EINES MAGNETRESONANZ-BILDDATENSATZES UND ERZEUGUNG EINES BEWEGUNGSKORRIGIERTEN BILDDATENSATZES | [2024/25] | English: | METHOD FOR ACQUIRING A MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGE DATASET AND GENERATING A MOTION-CORRECTED IMAGE DATASET | [2024/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ACQUISITION D'UN ENSEMBLE DE DONNÉES D'IMAGE PAR RÉSONANCE MAGNÉTIQUE ET DE GÉNÉRATION D'UN ENSEMBLE DE DONNÉES D'IMAGE À CORRECTION DE MOUVEMENT | [2024/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IAY]US2008129289 (STEMMER ALTO [DE], et al); | [Y]US7715899 (HARVEY PAUL ROYSTON [NL], et al); | [A]US2022326330 (POLAK DANIEL [DE], et al); |