EP4169451 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IMPROVING ULTRASOUND IMAGE QUALITY BY APPLYING WEIGHTING FACTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maui Imaging, Inc. 6280 San Ignacio Avenue, Suite E San Jose, CA 95119 / US | [2023/24] |
Former [2023/17] | For all designated states Maui Imaging, Inc. 256 Gibraltar Drive, Suite 107 Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Call, Josef R Sunnyvale, 94089 / US | 02 /
Specht, Donald F Sunnyvale, 94089 / US | 03 /
Brewer, Kenneth D Sunnyvale, 94089 / US | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [2023/17] | Application number, filing date | 22214147.5 | 26.03.2013 | [2023/17] | Priority number, date | US201261615735P | 26.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261615735 P | [2023/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4169451 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/00, G01N29/24, G06T5/00, A61B8/14, A61B8/08, G01S15/89, G01S7/52 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
A61B8/145 (EP,US);
A61B8/5246 (US);
A61B8/4477 (EP,US);
A61B8/4483 (US);
A61B8/461 (US);
A61B8/5207 (EP,US);
A61B8/5253 (EP,US);
A61B8/54 (EP,US);
G01S15/8913 (EP,US);
G01S15/8927 (EP,US);
G01S15/8952 (EP,US);
G01S7/52046 (EP,US);
G06N3/084 (US);
A61B8/4245 (EP,US);
A61B8/4427 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER ULTRASCHALLBILDQUALITÄT DURCH ANWENDUNG VON GEWICHTUNGSFAKTOREN | [2023/17] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IMPROVING ULTRASOUND IMAGE QUALITY BY APPLYING WEIGHTING FACTORS | [2023/17] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR AMÉLIORER LA QUALITÉ D'IMAGE ULTRASONORE PAR APPLICATION DE FACTEURS DE PONDÉRATION | [2023/17] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/17] | 25.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13768385.0 / EP2833791 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2001014773 (JAGO JAMES R [US]) [Y] 2 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0030] *; | [XYI]WO2011094585 (UNIV VIRGINIA [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * abstract * * figures 1-9 * * page 2, line 10 - page 27, line 8 * [Y] 2 [I] 4,5; | [AD]US2011201933 (SPECHT DONALD F [US], et al) [AD] 1-5 * abstract * * figures 1-5 ** paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0089] * | by applicant | US2010201933 | US2010262013 | US2010268503 | US2011201933 | US8007439 | US2012057428 | US2012095347 | US2012095343 | US20070865501 | US20100760375 | US20100760327 |