EP4213322 - CONNECTION ASSEMBLY BETWEEN TWO ELECTRICAL CABLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexans 4, Allée de l'Arche 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2023/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARPENTIER, Ludovic 08200 Floing / FR | 02 /
DURMOIS, Lionel 08300 Lucquy / FR | 03 /
DE BUYST, Jo 9340 Lede / BE | 04 /
VAN BOXSTAEL, Eddy 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2023/29] | Representative(s) | Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [2023/29] | Application number, filing date | 22214227.5 | 16.12.2022 | [2023/29] | Priority number, date | FR20220000209 | 12.01.2022 Original published format: FR 2200209 | [2023/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4213322 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02G1/14, H01R4/72, H02G15/18 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
H02G15/1806 (EP);
H02G1/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/09] |
Former [2023/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSANORDNUNG ZWISCHEN ZWEI ELEKTRISCHEN KABELN | [2023/29] | English: | CONNECTION ASSEMBLY BETWEEN TWO ELECTRICAL CABLES | [2023/29] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE CONNEXION ENTRE DEUX CÂBLES ÉLECTRIQUES | [2023/29] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/09] | 19.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 22.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 22.02.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 22.02.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.03.2024 | Decision despatched |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2474626 (BIRKETT ELECTRIC LTD [GB]) [A] 1-6 * figures 1, 3 *; | [A]US2015096803 (POPE MARTIN [GB], et al) [A] 1-6* figures 11, 12 *; | [I]EP3454424 (ENSTO OY [FI]) [I] 1-6 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 2] , [0 19] , [0 33] , [0 36] , [0 47]; figures 1, 2, 3a, 3b *; | [A]EP3758150 (NEXANS [FR]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0030]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2021165744 (NVENT SERVICES GMBH [CH]) [A] 1-6 * figures 10,11 * |