EP4206387 - HANGER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 08.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | 08.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2024/37] |
Former [2023/27] | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Joogyeom Seoul / KR | 02 /
YOO, Hyunsun Seoul / KR | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/27] | Application number, filing date | 22214987.4 | 20.12.2022 | [2023/27] | Priority number, date | KR20220000976 | 04.01.2022 Original published format: KR 20220000976 | [2023/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4206387 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4206387 | Date: | 11.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | D06F58/10, // D06F57/12 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
D06F58/10 (EP);
D06F59/02 (KR);
D06F58/00 (CN);
A47G25/28 (KR);
D06F34/34 (KR);
D06F58/20 (CN);
D06F58/26 (CN);
D06F58/263 (KR);
D06F73/00 (CN,KR);
F21K9/00 (KR);
F21V33/0004 (KR);
F22B1/28 (CN);
F24F13/0236 (KR);
F24F13/28 (CN,KR);
F24F3/14 (CN,KR);
F24F3/1411 (CN);
F24F6/18 (CN,KR);
F24F8/108 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/33] |
Former [2023/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUFHÄNGEVORRICHTUNG | [2023/27] | English: | HANGER DEVICE | [2023/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SUSPENSION | [2023/27] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | 13.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]JP2003176930 (TOSHIBA CARRIER KK); | [XA]WO2006059225 (CANNIZZO ROCCO [IT], et al); | [A]KR20080073088 (DAE YOUNG CO LTD [KR]); | [IA]KR20110035030 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [XAI]JP2012065864 (PANASONIC CORP); | [XAI]US2017233942 (EUN YOUSOOK [KR], et al); | [XA]JP2018057413 (QINGDAO HAIER WASHING MACH CO, et al); | [XA]KR102261579B (SAMSUNG C&T CORP [KR]) | by applicant | KR20180128746 |