EP4202499 - LIDAR ANTI-INTERFERENCE METHOD AND APPARATUS, STORAGE MEDIUM, AND LIDAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suteng Innovation Technology Co., Ltd 1st Floor, Building 9, Block 2 Zhongguan Honghualing Industry Southern District, 1213 Liuxian Avenue Taoyuan Street, Nanshan District Shenzhen City Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DU, Yajun Shenzhen City, 518000 / CN | 02 /
PAN, Shengqiang Shenzhen City, 518000 / CN | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Ran, Handong, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 22215804.0 | 22.12.2022 | [2023/26] | Priority number, date | CN202111593084 | 23.12.2021 Original published format: CN202111593084 | CN202111681548 | 31.12.2021 Original published format: CN202111681548 | [2023/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4202499 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/89, G01S7/481, G01S7/4863, G01S7/497 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
G01S7/4815 (EP);
G01S7/4808 (US);
G01S17/42 (EP);
G01S17/89 (EP,US);
G01S7/4802 (US);
G01S7/4816 (EP);
G01S7/4817 (EP);
G01S7/484 (EP);
G01S7/4863 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] |
Former [2023/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LIDAR-INTERFERENZSCHUTZVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG, SPEICHERMEDIUM UND LIDAR | [2023/26] | English: | LIDAR ANTI-INTERFERENCE METHOD AND APPARATUS, STORAGE MEDIUM, AND LIDAR | [2023/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL ANTI-INTERFÉRENCE LIDAR, SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE ET LIDAR | [2023/26] | Examination procedure | 16.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | 16.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US10613203 (REKOW MATTHEW [US], et al) [Y] 5-7* columns 3,4; figure 8 *; | [XY]US2020309955 (LAFLAQUIÈRE ARNAUD [SG], et al) [X] 1-4,8,9 * paragraphs [0019] - [0043] * [Y] 5-7 |