EP4216688 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR COOLING ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 22.03.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | 22.03.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borgwarner Luxembourg Automotive Systems SA Avenue de Luxembourg 4940 Bascharage / LU | [2023/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
David, Pascal Luxembourg / LU | 02 /
Ebenhart, Mark Alan Kokomo (Indiana) / US | 03 /
Cipriano, Marc Russange / FR | [2023/30] | Representative(s) | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [2023/30] | Application number, filing date | 22216225.7 | 22.12.2022 | [2023/30] | Priority number, date | US202217580409 | 20.01.2022 Original published format: US202217580409 | [2023/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4216688 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4216688 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20, B60L50/50, H01G2/08, H01G4/40, H02M7/00 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
H05K7/20927 (EP,US);
B60R16/02 (CN);
H05K7/20872 (EP,US);
H01G2/08 (EP,CN);
H01G2/10 (EP,CN);
H01G4/224 (EP);
H01G4/40 (EP);
B60L2240/36 (EP);
B60L50/50 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] |
Former [2023/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR KÜHLUNG ELEKTRONISCHER KOMPONENTEN EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2023/30] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR COOLING ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS OF A VEHICLE | [2023/30] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE COMPOSANTS ÉLECTRONIQUES D'UN VÉHICULE | [2023/30] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/17] | 18.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2006989 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 5-7 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0043] *; | [XY]DE102019116179 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0070]; figures 1,2,11,12, 14-21 * [Y] 5-7; | [Y]EP3653418 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 7* paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0066]; figures 3-12 * |