EP4219197 - TRANSPORT MEANS AND SEMI-RIGID AXLE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 02.02.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | 02.02.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | 02.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Croozer GmbH An der Hasenkaule 10 50354 Hürth / DE | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THIEL, Karl 22763 Hamburg / DE | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Lenzing Gerber Stute PartG von Patentanwälten m.b.B. Bahnstraße 9 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 22216648.0 | 23.12.2022 | [2023/31] | Priority number, date | DE202220100469U | 27.01.2022 Original published format: DE 202022100469 U | DE20221000365 | 27.01.2022 Original published format: DE102022000365 | [2023/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4219197 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60G21/05, B62K27/06 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
B62K27/003 (EP);
B60G21/051 (EP);
B60G2200/20 (EP);
B60G2200/21 (EP);
B60G2200/341 (EP);
B60G2202/1362 (EP);
B60G2206/20 (EP);
B60G2300/04 (EP);
B60G2300/12 (EP);
B62K27/06 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] |
Former [2023/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEFÖRDERUNGSMITTEL UND DAFÜR VORGESEHENE KOPPELLENKERACHSE | [2023/31] | English: | TRANSPORT MEANS AND SEMI-RIGID AXLE THEREFOR | [2023/31] | French: | MOYEN DE TRANSPORT ET ESSIEU TORSIBLE PRÉVU À CET EFFET | [2023/31] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/10] | 31.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE2700369 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG) [X] 1,4-7,9-11,13,15 * abstract * * figures 1, 2 * * claims 1, 3 * [I] 8,12,14; | [X]CA2228344 (BEAUDOIN MAURICE [CA], et al) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO02066270 (SARDOU MAX [FR]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]WO2018095662 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE19507397 | DE102013109230 |