EP4389152 - CONJUGATES OF PBD PRODRUGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synaffix B.V. Kloosterstraat 9 5349 AB Oss / NL | [2024/26] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2024/26] | Application number, filing date | 22216669.6 | 23.12.2022 | [2024/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4389152 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/68, A61P35/00 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
A61K47/6851 (EP);
A61K47/68035 (EP);
A61K47/6889 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONJUGATE VON PBD-PRODRUGS | [2024/26] | English: | CONJUGATES OF PBD PRODRUGS | [2024/26] | French: | CONJUGUÉS DE PROMÉDICAMENTS DE PBD | [2024/26] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2018146188 (MEDIMMUNE LTD [GB]); | [X]WO2018146189 (ADC THERAPEUTICS SA [CH], et al); | [A]WO2018146199 (ADC THERAPEUTICS SA [CH], et al); | [X]WO2018193102 (ADC THERAPEUTICS SA [CH], et al); | [X]WO2020127573 (ADC THERAPEUTICS SA [CH], et al); | [XI]WO2021144313 (SYNAFFIX BV [NL]); | [X]WO2021144314 (SYNAFFIX BV [NL]); | [A]WO2021260232 (SYNAFFIX BV [NL]); | [X]WO2022167689 (SYNAFFIX BV [NL]); | by applicant | WO2012153193 | WO2013173391 | WO2014065661 | WO2014114207 | WO2016053107 | WO2016170186 | WO2019034764 | WO2020141923 | US2022218830 |