blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4205779

EP4205779 - IV SYSTEMS - INFUSION PUMP FOR DETECTING COLOR OF TUBING CLAMP USING IR MARKERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.01.2024
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  02.06.2023
Most recent event   Tooltip21.12.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
B. Braun Melsungen AG
Carl-Braun-Straße 1
34212 Melsungen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2023/27]For all designated states
B. Braun Melsungen AG
Carl-Braun-Strasse 1
34212 Melsungen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KATERKAMP, Andreas
34212 Melsungen / DE
02 / DISCHER, Markus
34593 Knüllwald / DE
03 / ERLEN, Christoph
34132 Kassel / DE
04 / BÜRGER, Maria
34323 Malsfeld / DE
05 / SCHWARZ, Jan
34212 Melsungen / DE
06 / RICHARDT, Mario
34289 Zierenberg / DE
07 / HOEVEL, Stephan
34121 Kassel / DE
08 / FRAGNER, Jan
34134 Kassel / DE
09 / HERR, Jan Eric
34119 Kassel / DE
10 / SCHUMACHER, Volker
88339 Bad Waldsee / DE
11 / PAUL, Simon
88400 Biberach / DE
12 / JEDELHAUSER, Raphael
89129 Langenau / DE
 [2023/27]
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB
Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22
85354 Freising / DE
[2023/27]
Application number, filing date22216745.427.12.2022
[2023/27]
Priority number, dateDE20211021506728.12.2021         Original published format: DE102021215067
[2023/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4205779
Date:05.07.2023
Language:DE
[2023/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.04.2023
ClassificationIPC:A61M5/142, A61M5/14, A61M5/168, A61M39/28
[2023/27]
CPC:
A61M5/142 (EP,CN,US); A61M39/284 (US); A61M39/28 (CN);
A61M39/286 (CN); A61M39/287 (EP,CN); A61M5/1413 (EP);
A61M5/16813 (CN); A61M5/16881 (EP); A61M2205/128 (EP);
A61M2205/14 (CN); A61M2205/50 (EP); A61M2205/6018 (CN);
A61M2205/6045 (US); A61M2205/6081 (EP,CN,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   ME,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/06]
Former [2023/27]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  ME,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:IV SYSTEMS - INFUSIONSPUMPE ZUR ERKENNUNG DER FARBE EINER SCHLAUCHKLEMME MIT IR-MARKERN[2023/27]
English:IV SYSTEMS - INFUSION PUMP FOR DETECTING COLOR OF TUBING CLAMP USING IR MARKERS[2023/27]
French:POMPE À PERFUSION DE SYSTÈME IV POUR DÉTECTER LA COULEUR D'UN COLLIER DE SERRAGE DE TUYAU SOUPLE À L'AIDE DE MARQUEURS IR[2023/27]
Examination procedure03.01.2024Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.01.2024Examination requested  [2024/06]
03.01.2024Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US5290239  (MYREN ERIC [US]) [A] 1-11 * column 11, lines 31-57 * * figure 12 *;
 [A]US6635033  (HILL ROGER J [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 5, lines 23-50 ** figures 1-11 *;
 [XDA]US2006224128  (LURVEY KENT [US], et al) [XD] 11 * the whole document * [A] 1-10
by applicantUS2006224128
 US9272129
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.