EP4205861 - APPARATUS FOR SPRAYING CONCRETE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wurtz, Paul-Antoine Packertstrasse 15 47441 Moers / DE | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | Griepenstroh, Jörg Bockermann Ksoll Griepenstroh Osterhoff Patentanwälte Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | [2023/27] | Application number, filing date | 22216860.1 | 28.12.2022 | [2023/27] | Priority number, date | DE20211006406 | 29.12.2021 Original published format: DE102021006406 | [2023/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4205861 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B05B1/28, B05B7/08, B05B7/14, B05B7/12, B05B12/14, B28C5/02, E04F21/12 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
B05B7/149 (EP);
B05B1/28 (EP);
B05B7/0815 (EP);
B28C5/026 (EP);
F27D1/16 (EP);
B05B12/1418 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM SPRITZEN VON BETON | [2023/27] | English: | APPARATUS FOR SPRAYING CONCRETE | [2023/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROJECTION DE BÉTON | [2023/27] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | 29.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9840168 (NORTH AMERICAN REFRACTORIES [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9-12 * abstract * * page 7, line 4 * [Y] 9,13-15; | [Y]FR2798092 (LAFARGE REFRACTORIES [FR]) [Y] 9 * abstract * * page 16, line 31 - line 34 *; | [Y]WO2017021259 (HOLZWEBER MARIA ELISABETH [AT], et al) [Y] 13-15 * abstract ** page 32, line 14 - line 21 *; | [X]EP3431172 (BAUMIT BETEILIGUNGEN GMBH [AT]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0054] * |