blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4216696

EP4216696 - LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.06.2023
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip18.11.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Display Co., Ltd.
1, Samsung-ro
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR
For all designated states
Merck Patent GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 250
64293 Darmstadt / DE
[2023/30]
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Mikyung
17113 Yongin-si / KR
02 / MONTENEGRO, Elvira
64293 Darmstadt / DE
03 / ENGELHART, Jens
64293 Darmstadt / DE
04 / EICKHOFF, Christian
64293 Darmstadt / DE
05 / NA, Suhwan
64293 Darmstadt / DE
06 / KIM, Hyerim
17113 Yongin-si / KR
07 / SEO, Jihyun
17113 Yongin-si / KR
08 / SHIN, Hyunsu
17113 Yongin-si / KR
09 / JANG, Hanbyul
17113 Yongin-si / KR
 [2023/30]
Representative(s)Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[2023/30]
Application number, filing date22217232.229.12.2022
[2023/30]
Priority number, dateKR2021019424831.12.2021         Original published format: KR 20210194248
KR2022001847011.02.2022         Original published format: KR 20220018470
[2023/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4216696
Date:26.07.2023
Language:EN
[2023/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.06.2023
ClassificationIPC:H10K85/60, // H10K50/15
[2023/30]
CPC:
H10K85/633 (EP,US); H10K50/156 (EP,US); H10K85/626 (EP);
H10K85/636 (EP); H10K85/6574 (EP,US); H10K2101/10 (US);
H10K2101/30 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   ME,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG DAMIT[2023/30]
English:LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS INCLUDING THE SAME[2023/30]
French:DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ET APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE LE COMPRENANT[2023/30]
Examination procedure24.03.2023Examination requested  [2023/30]
11.09.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.09.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.11.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2007072952  (CANON KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-12 * page 10 - page 47, line 23; figures 1-4; claims 1-12; tables 1-3 *[I] 2,13-15;
 [XI]WO2017207596  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-13,15 * page 43 - page 97; claims 1-15; tables 1-3 * [I] 14
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.