EP4360723 - SNOW BASKET QUICK-RELEASE SYSTEM FOR A SKI POLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zheng, Zhouyang Room 401, No. 433, Yuhou Nanli, Siming District Xiamen Fujian / CN | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHENG, Zhouyang Xiamen / CN | 02 /
HUANG, Yuqiu Xiamen / CN | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | Bayramoglu et al. Mira Office Kanuni Sultan Süleyman Boulevard 5387 Street Beytepe, floor 12, no:50 06800 Cankaya, Ankara / TR | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 22217242.1 | 29.12.2022 | [2024/18] | Priority number, date | CN202222876170U | 28.10.2022 Original published format: CN 202222876170 U | [2024/18] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4360723 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4360723 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A63C11/24 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
A63C11/227 (EP,US);
A63C11/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Title | German: | SCHNEEKORBSCHNELLLÖSESYSTEM FÜR EINEN SKISTOCK | [2024/18] | English: | SNOW BASKET QUICK-RELEASE SYSTEM FOR A SKI POLE | [2024/18] | French: | SYSTÈME DE LIBÉRATION RAPIDE DE PANIER À NEIGE POUR BÂTON DE SKI | [2024/18] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2022 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 26.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6390109 (MANNINEN TAISTO [FI]); | [Y]US2018177268 (D'JAY DOUGLAS J [US]); | [A]US2018295954 (HEIM EBERHARD [DE]); | [E]US11701572 (ZHENG ZHOUYANG [CN], et al) | Examination | USD1000563S |