EP4218717 - OPHTHALMIC COMPOSITION COMPRISING RESVERATROL FOR TREATING DRY EYE SYNDROME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laboratoires THEA 12, rue Louis Blériot Zone Industrielle du Brézet 63100 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEBRETON, Luc 63110 Beaumont / FR | 02 /
ALLAN, Fanny 63111 Mur sur Allier / FR | 03 /
NAJI, Mohammed 63800 Cournon d'Auvergne / FR | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Laurent & Charras Le Contemporain 50 Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cedex / FR | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 22305113.7 | 01.02.2022 | [2023/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4218717 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K9/08, A61K31/00, A61K47/26, A61P27/02, A61K47/36 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
A61K9/0048 (EP,IL);
A61J1/067 (EP,IL);
A61K31/05 (EP,IL);
A61K31/702 (EP,IL);
A61K31/728 (EP,IL);
A61K47/26 (EP,IL);
A61K47/36 (EP,IL);
A61K9/08 (EP,IL);
A61P27/02 (EP,IL);
A61K2300/00 (IL)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/05, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/702, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/728, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPHTHALMISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT RESVERATROL ZUR BEHANDLUNG DES TROCKENEN-AUGEN-SYNDROMS | [2023/31] | English: | OPHTHALMIC COMPOSITION COMPRISING RESVERATROL FOR TREATING DRY EYE SYNDROME | [2023/31] | French: | COMPOSITION OPHTALMIQUE COMPRENANT DU RESVÉRATROL POUR TRAITER LE SYNDROME DE L' OEIL SEC | [2023/38] |
Former [2023/31] | COMPOSITION OPHTALMIQUE COMPRENANT DU RESVÉRATROL POUR TRAITER LE SYNDROME DE L' IL SEC | Examination procedure | 03.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/26] | 23.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2009084069 (LIO FARMACEUTICI SRL [IT], et al); | [A]KR101433152B ; | [A]US2021046018 (AICHER SUE A [US], et al); | [A]CN113286577 (CORDEIRO MARIA FRANCESCA, et al); | by applicant | WO2009087229 | WO2015136186 | WO2016151269 |