EP4360619 - DOSAGE FORM FOR INTRA-ARTICULAR INJECTION COMPRISING COLCHICINE AND AN ANESTHESIC AGENT IN THE TREATMENT OF CRYSTAL-AND NON-CRYSTAL ASSOCIATED ACUTE INFLAMMATORY ARTHRITIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2024 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PK MED 12-14 rue Jean Antoine de Baif 75013 Paris / FR | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 22306613.5 | 25.10.2022 | [2024/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4360619 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K31/165, A61K31/445, A61K47/34, A61P29/00, A61P19/02, A61K9/10, // A61K9/16 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61K31/165 (EP);
A61K31/167 (EP);
A61K31/445 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K9/0019 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/165, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/167, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/445, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DARREICHUNGSFORM FÜR INTRAARTIKULÄRE INJEKTION MIT COLCHICIN UND EINEM ANÄSTHETIKUM BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON KRISTALL- UND NICHTKRISTALLASSOZIIERTER AKUTER ENTZÜNDLICHER ARTHRITIS | [2024/18] | English: | DOSAGE FORM FOR INTRA-ARTICULAR INJECTION COMPRISING COLCHICINE AND AN ANESTHESIC AGENT IN THE TREATMENT OF CRYSTAL-AND NON-CRYSTAL ASSOCIATED ACUTE INFLAMMATORY ARTHRITIS | [2024/18] | French: | FORME POSOLOGIQUE POUR INJECTION INTRA-ARTICULAIRE COMPRENANT DE LA COLCHICINE ET UN AGENT ANESTHÉSIQUE DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE L'ARTHRITE INFLAMMATOIRE AIGUË ASSOCIÉE AUX CRISTAUX ET AUX NON-CRISTAUX | [2024/18] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDYI]US5747060 (SACKLER RICHARD [US], et al) [XD] 1-9,11-14 * claims 1, 4, 5, 6, 8, 9, 11, 13 * * column 3, line 36 - line 38 * * column 4, line 40 - line 49 * * column 5, line 35 - line 43 * * column 7, line 7 - line 35 * * column 7, line 58 - column 8, line 5 * * column 10, line 54 - line 63 * * column 10, line 66 - column 11, line 4 * * column 13, line 41 - line 55 * * column 16, line 7 - line 16 * * column 16, line 23 - line 25 * * column 17, line 34 - column 18, line 43; example 1 * * column 18, line 45 - column 19, line 57; tables I-II * [Y] 17-22 [I] 10,15,16; | [Y]US2002054915 (GOLDENHEIM PAUL [US], et al) [Y] 17-22 * claims 1, 2, 3, 4, 8, 15 * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0135] * * paragraph [0147] * * paragraph [0157] * * paragraph [0187] - paragraph [0189]; example 12; table 3 *; | [T] - BURT HELEN M ET AL, "Intra-articular drug delivery systems: Overcoming the shortcomings of joint disease therapy.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (200901), Database accession no. NLM19236205, XP002808823 [T] 1-22 * the whole document * | [ ] - BURT HELEN M ET AL, "Intra-articular drug delivery systems: Overcoming the shortcomings of joint disease therapy.", EXPERT OPINION ON DRUG DELIVERY, (20090109), vol. 6, no. 1, doi:0.1517/17425240802647259, ISSN 1744-7593, pages 17 - 26, XP002808953 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/0.1517/17425240802647259 | by applicant | US5747060 | WO2006066419 | - GEORGE NUKMB, FRCP, "Colchicine: its Mechanism of Action and Efficacy in Crystal-Induced Inflammation", Current Rheumatology Reports, (20080000), vol. 10, pages 218 - 227 | - DAS, G. S. et al., "Colchicine Encapsulation within Poly(Ethylene Glycol)-Coated Poly(Lactic Acid)/Poly(s-Caprolactone) Microspheres-Controlled Release Studies", Drug Delivery, (20000000), vol. 7, no. 7544, doi:10.1080/10717540050120160, pages 129 - 138, XP055562692 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/10717540050120160 | - GRADUS-PIZLO IRMINA et al., "local delivery of biodegradable microcapsules containing colchicine or a colchicine analogue: effects on restenosis and implications of catheter-based drug delivery", Journal of The American College of Cardiology, vol. 26, no. 6, doi:10.1016/0735-1097(95)00345-2, pages 1549 - 1557, XP029665111 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0735-1097(95)00345-2 | - RICHETTE, P. et al., "2016 updated EULAR evidence-based recommendations for the management of gout", Ann. Rheum. Dis., (20170000), vol. 76, pages 29 - 42 | - ABOUMANEI et al., "intra-articular formulation of colchicine loaded nanoemulsion systems for enhanced locoregional drug delivery", vitro characterization, Tc coupling and in vivo biodistribution studies | - DECRISTOFORO et al., "The influence of chelator on the pharmacokinetics of 99mTc-labelled peptides", Q. J. NUCL. MED., (20020000), vol. 46, no. 3, pages 195 - 205, XP008051358 | - NUKI, G. COLCHICINE, "Its mechanism of action and efficacy in crystal-induced inflammation", Curr. Rheumatol. Rep., (20080000), vol. 10, pages 218 - 227 | - WALLACE SLS. J. REVIEW, "systemic toxicity associated with the intravenous administration of colchicine - guidelines for use", J Rheumatol., (19880000), vol. 15, pages 495 - 9 | - BONNEL, R. A.VILLALBA, M. L.KARWOSKI, C. B.BEITZ, J., "Deaths associated with inappropriate intravenous colchicine administration", J. Emerg. Med., (20020000), vol. 22, pages 385 - 387 | - ZHANG, W. et al., "EULAR evidence-based recommendations for gout. Part II: Management. Report of a task force of the EULAR Standing Committee for International Clinical Studies Including Therapeutics (ESCISIT", Ann. Rheum. Dis., (20060000), vol. 65, pages 1312 - 1324 | - E.NIEL et al., "Colchicine today", Joint Bone Spine, (20060000), vol. 73, doi:10.1016/j.jbspin.2006.03.006, pages 672 - 678, XP028072909 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jbspin.2006.03.006 | - TERKELTAUB, R. A. et al., "High versus low dosing of oral colchicine for early acute gout flare: Twenty-four-hour outcome of the first multicenter, randomized, double-blind, placebo-controlled, parallel-group, dose-comparison colchicine study", Arthritis Rheum., (20100000), vol. 62, pages 1060 - 1068 | - PETIT, A.REDOUT, E. M.VAN DE LEST, C. H.DE GRAUW, J. C.MULLER, B.MEYBOOM, R.VAN MIDWOUD, P.VERMONDEN, THENNINK, W. E.RENE VAN WEEREN, P., "Sustained intra-articular release of celecoxib from in situ forming gels made of acetyl-capped PCLA-PEG-PCLA triblock copolymers in horses", Biomaterials, vol. 53, doi:10.1016/j.biomaterials.2015.02.109, (20150000), pages 426 - 436, URL: https://doi.org/10.1016/i.biomaterials.2015.02.109, XP055346147 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2015.02.109 | - WORBOYS PDWONG SLBARRIERE SL, "Pharmacokinetics of intravenous telavancin in healthy subjects with varying degrees of renal impairment", Eur J Clin Pharmacol, (20150600), vol. 71, no. 6, pages 707 - 714 | - L. RAHNFELD et al., "Injectable Lipid-Based Depot Formulations: Where Do We Stand?", Pharmaceutics, (20200000), vol. 12, no. 6, page 567 | - S. KEMPE et al., "In-situ forming implants-an attractive formulation principle for parenteral depot formulations", Journal of Controlled Release, (20120000), vol. 161, doi:10.1016/j.jconrel.2012.04.016, page 668, XP028492692 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2012.04.016 | - SCHOUBBEN, ARICCI, M.GIOVAGNOLI, S, "Meeting the unmet: from traditional to cutting-edge techniques for poly lactide and poly lactide-co-glycolide microparticle manufacturing", J. Pharm. Investig., (20190000), vol. 49, doi:10.1007/s40005-019-00446-y, pages 381 - 404, XP036893217 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s40005-019-00446-y | - GIOVAGNOLI, S. et al., "Physicochemical characterization and release mechanism of a novel prednisone biodegradable microsphere formulation", J Pharm Sci., (20080000), vol. 97, pages 303 - 317 | - K.S. OH et al., "Preclinical studies of ropivacaine extended-release from a temperature responsive hydrogel for prolonged relief of pain at the surgical wound", Int. J. of. Pharmaceutics, (20190000), vol. 558, doi:10.1016/j.ijpharm.2019.01.011, pages 225 - 230, XP085598494 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijpharm.2019.01.011 |