Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
23.05.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
19.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
19.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
19.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
19.04.2024 | First examination report | |
15.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
07.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
06.12.2022 | Change - representative |