EP4207945 - INDUCTION COOKING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 22.12.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | 22.12.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Groupe Brandt 89-91 boulevard Franklin Roosevelt 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDRÉ, Xavier 45380 LA CHAPELLE SAINT MESMIN / FR | 02 /
GOUMY, Cédric 45190 TAVERS / FR | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [2023/27] | Application number, filing date | 22307047.5 | 27.12.2022 | [2023/27] | Priority number, date | FR20210014680 | 30.12.2021 Original published format: FR 2114680 | [2023/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4207945 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/06 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
H05B6/062 (EP);
H05B2213/03 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] |
Former [2023/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INDUKTIONSKOCHGERÄT | [2023/27] | English: | INDUCTION COOKING APPARATUS | [2023/27] | French: | APPAREIL DE CUISSON À INDUCTION | [2023/27] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/04] | 19.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011147375 (LOMP STEPHANE [FR]) [X] 1,4,5,8 * figures 2,3 * [I] 2,3,6,7,9-12; | [A]US9060389 (LEE SUNG HO [KR], et al) [A] 1-12 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2019254125 (MILANESI FILIPPO [IT], et al) [A] 1-12* paragraphs [0043] , [0044]; figure 6B * |