EP4393963 - METHODS FOR PREPARING MULTISTAGE POLYMER PARTICLE COMPOSITIONS AND CURABLE FORMULATIONS FOR THREE-DIMENSIONAL PRINTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARKEMA FRANCE 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [2024/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REN, Kangtai EXTON, 19341 / US | 02 /
LI, Ling EXTON, 19341 / US | 03 /
HE, Yuhong EXTON, 19341 / US | 04 /
WOLF, William 19341, EXTON / US | 05 /
KLANG, Jeff EXTON, 19341 / US | [2024/27] | Representative(s) | Arkema Patent Arkema France DRD-DPI 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | [2024/27] | Application number, filing date | 22307078.0 | 31.12.2022 | [2024/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4393963 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C08F6/00, C08F6/02, C08F6/06 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
C08F6/008 (EP);
C08F6/02 (EP);
C08F6/06 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F6/008, C08L51/003 (EP);
C08F6/02, C08L51/003 (EP);
C08F6/06, C08L51/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG MEHRSTUFIGER POLYMERPARTIKELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND HÄRTBARE FORMULIERUNGEN FÜR DREIDIMENSIONALES DRUCKEN | [2024/27] | English: | METHODS FOR PREPARING MULTISTAGE POLYMER PARTICLE COMPOSITIONS AND CURABLE FORMULATIONS FOR THREE-DIMENSIONAL PRINTING | [2024/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION DE COMPOSITIONS DE PARTICULES POLYMÈRES À PLUSIEURS ÉTAGES ET FORMULATIONS DURCISSABLES POUR IMPRESSION TRIDIMENSIONNELLE | [2024/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO2016102666 (ARKEMA FRANCE [FR]); | [YA]US2017355802 (NAVARRO CHRISTOPHE [FR], et al); | [IAY]WO2019012088 (ARKEMA FRANCE [FR]); | [IAY]WO2020001835 (ARKEMA FRANCE [FR]); | [IAY]WO2021105508 (ARKEMA FRANCE [FR]) | by applicant | US3835003 | US5674922 | US5750590 | US5981616 | US6015914 | US6469108 | US2010222512 |