EP4306109 - NEW ANTIBIOTIC COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Université de la Côte d'Azur Grand Château 28 Avenue de Valrose 06100 Nice / FR | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3 rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | For all designated states Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUNRO, Patrick 06100 Nice / FR | 02 /
PIRES GONCALVES, Leticia 06100 Nice / FR | 03 /
BENHIDA, Rachid 06000 Nice / FR | 04 /
RONCO, Cyril 06100 Nice / FR | 05 /
BOYER, Laurent 06200 Nice / FR | [2024/03] | Representative(s) | LLR 2, rue Jean Lantier 75001 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2024/03] | LLR 11, boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 22315142.4 | 11.07.2022 | [2024/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4306109 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/428, A61P31/04 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
A61K31/428 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE ANTIBIOTISCHE VERBINDUNGEN | [2024/03] | English: | NEW ANTIBIOTIC COMPOUNDS | [2024/03] | French: | NOUVEAUX COMPOSÉS ANTIBIOTIQUES | [2024/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - T. Yabuuchi ET AL, "Synthesis of new antimicrobials. III. Synthesis of chlorine substituted 4 thiocyanatoaniline and 2 amino 6 chlorobenzothiazole derivatives", Chemical and Pharmaceutical Bulletin, (19750101), pages 659 - 663, URL: https://www.jstage.jst.go.jp/article/cpb1958/23/3/23_3_659/_pdf, (20160603), XP055277686 [X] 1-5,8,9,11,13 * pages 659, 662; table 2; compound 23 * | [XAI] - Obasi L N ET AL, "SYNTHESIS, SPECTROSCOPIC CHARACTERIZATION AND ANTIBACTERIAL SCREENING OF NOVEL N-(BENZOTHIAZOL-2-YL)ETHANAMIDES Introduction", Ecl. Quím, (20110101), URL: https://www.scielo.br/j/eq/a/DtG87vh4nRPwvPVYMNrKLsF/?lang=en, (20221207), XP093005834 [X] 1-4,8,9,11-13 * pages 9, 15; table 3; compounds 4, 5 * [A] 10 [I] 5-7,14,15 | by applicant | US3991210 | GB1482397 | - KALININ et al., Heterocycles, (20120000), vol. 85, pages 2515 - 2522 | - GRIVAS et al., Can. J. Chem., (19610000), vol. 39, pages 761 - 764 | - HOUGH et al., J. Heterocyclic Chem., (19840000), vol. 21, no. 5, pages 1377 - 1380 |