EP4394441 - A BEAMFORMING METHOD AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUPERSONIC IMAGINE ZAC de l'Enfant 135 Rue Emilien Gautier 13290 Aix en Provence / FR | [2024/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frappart, Thomas 13090 Aix-en-Provence / FR | 02 /
Lambert, William 13008 Marseille / FR | [2024/27] | Representative(s) | Paustian & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [2024/27] | Application number, filing date | 22315360.2 | 29.12.2022 | [2024/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4394441 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/52, G01S15/89, // A61B8/08, G10K11/34 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
G01S15/8915 (EP);
G01S7/5209 (KR);
G01S7/5202 (EP,US);
A61B8/483 (US);
G01S15/8918 (US);
G01S15/8997 (EP,KR);
G01S7/52026 (EP);
G01S7/52046 (EP,KR);
G10K11/346 (EP);
G01S15/8925 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STRAHLFORMUNGSVERFAHREN UND -SYSTEM | [2024/27] | English: | A BEAMFORMING METHOD AND SYSTEM | [2024/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE FORMATION DE FAISCEAU | [2024/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP3207878 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) | by applicant | WO2017093778 | US2022287685 |