EP4234720 - EPIGENETIC BIOMARKERS FOR THE DIAGNOSIS OF THYROID CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Consejo Superior de Investigaciones Cientificas Serrano, 117 28006 Madrid / ES | For all designated states Fundacion Para La Investigacion e Innovacion Biosanitaria Principado de Asturias Avenida de Roma s/n 33011 Oviedo / ES | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rodríguez-Rodero, Sandra 28006 Madrid / ES | 02 /
Tejedor Vaquero, Juan Ramón 28006 Madrid / ES | 03 /
Fernández Fernández, Agustín 28006 Madrid / ES | 04 /
Fernández Fraga, Mario 28006 Madrid / ES | 05 /
Delgado Álvarez, Elías 33011 Oviedo (ASTURIAS) / ES | 06 /
Morales Sánchez, Paula 33011 Oviedo (ASTURIAS) / ES | 07 /
Menendez Torre, Edelmiro 33011 Oviedo (ASTURIAS) / ES | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Pons Glorieta Rubén Darío 4 28010 Madrid / ES | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 22382165.3 | 25.02.2022 | [2023/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4234720 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6886 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP);
C12Q2600/118 (EP);
C12Q2600/154 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EPIGENETISCHE BIOMARKER ZUR DIAGNOSE VON SCHILDDRÜSENKREBS | [2023/35] | English: | EPIGENETIC BIOMARKERS FOR THE DIAGNOSIS OF THYROID CANCER | [2023/35] | French: | BIOMARQUEURS ÉPIGÉNÉTIQUES POUR LE DIAGNOSTIC DU CANCER DE LA THYROÏDE | [2023/35] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/32] | 25.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1942197 (EPIGENOMICS AG [DE]) [A] 1* SEQ ID NO:27766 from Patent EP1942197 comprises SEQ ID NO:3 of the present application *; | [I]WO2020204457 (CATHOLIC UNIV KOREA IND ACADEMIC COOPERATION FOUNDATION [KR], et al) [I] 1-14 * claim 1 *; | [A] - ABDUL A QURESHI ET AL, "Genomic differences in benign and malignant follicular thyroid tumours using 1-Mb array-comparative genomic hybridisation", EUROPEAN ARCHIVES OF OTO-RHINO-LARYNGOLOGY ; AND HEAD & NECK, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20120413), vol. 270, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S00405-012-2017-4, ISSN 1434-4726, pages 325 - 335, XP035157649 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00405-012-2017-4 | by applicant | WO2008097543 | WO2016020551 | US2017022570 | - "Analytical performance of the ThyroSeq v3 genomic classifier for cancer diagnosis in thyroid nodules", NIKIFOROVA MN et al., Cancer, John Wiley and Sons Inc., (20180000), vol. 124, pages 1682 - 90 | - ALEXANDER EK et al., "Preoperative Diagnosis of Benign Thyroid Nodules with Indeterminate Cytology", New England Journal of Medicine, (20120000), vol. 367, doi:10.1056/NEJMoa1203208, pages 705 - 15, XP055100797 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa1203208 | - "Molecular testing for miRNA, mRNA, and DNA on fine-needle aspiration improves the preoperative diagnosis of thyroid nodules with indeterminate cytology", LABOURIER E. et al., Journal of Clinical Endocrinology and Metabolism, Endocrine Society, (20150000), vol. 100, pages 2743 - 50 | - ZAFON C. et al., DNA methylation in thyroid cancer. Endocrine-Related Cancer, BioScientifica Ltd., (20190000), pages R415 - 39 | - "Comprehensive DNA Methylation Profiling Identifies Novel Diagnostic Biomarkers for Thyroid Cancer", PARK JL et al., Thyroid, Mary Ann Liebert Inc., (20200000), vol. 30, pages 192 - 203 |