EP4265434 - PROCEDURE AND MACHINE FOR DIGITAL DECORATION OF A SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Barberan Latorre, Jesús Francisco Pol. Ind. Camí Ral C/ Galileo 3-9 08860 Castelldefels (Barcelona) / ES | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2023/43] | Application number, filing date | 22382375.8 | 21.04.2022 | [2023/43] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4265434 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B44C5/04, B41M5/00, B41M7/00, E04F15/00, E04F15/10 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
B44C5/04 (EP);
B41J11/0015 (EP);
B41J11/002 (EP);
B41J11/00212 (EP);
B44C3/025 (EP);
B41M3/00 (EP);
B41M3/006 (EP);
B41M7/00 (EP);
B41M7/0081 (EP);
B41M7/009 (EP);
E04F13/10 (EP);
E04F13/12 (EP);
E04F13/18 (EP);
E04F15/04 (EP);
E04F15/06 (EP);
E04F15/105 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] |
Former [2023/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND MASCHINE ZUR DIGITALEN DEKORATION EINES SUBSTRATS | [2023/43] | English: | PROCEDURE AND MACHINE FOR DIGITAL DECORATION OF A SUBSTRATE | [2023/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET MACHINE POUR LA DÉCORATION NUMÉRIQUE D'UN SUBSTRAT | [2023/43] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2024 | Examination requested [2024/22] | 25.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]DE102015111110 (SCHULTE GUIDO [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,8,10,14,15,18-21 * figures 1,2,14 * * paragraphs [0008] , [0022] , [0033] , [0042] , [0047] , [0012] , [0050] , [0051] , [0052] * [A] 7[I] 3,6; | [XAI]EP3616939 (CERALOC INNOVATION AB [SE]) [X] 1,5,8-10,12,14-23 * figures 2a-2d,6a,7a * * paragraphs [0067] , [0107] , [0149] , [0158] , [0163] , [0167] , [0168] , [0193] , [0237] , [0238] * [A] 11 [I] 13 |