EP4273543 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR THE EVALUATION OF THE HYDRIC STATE OF A PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.08.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYDROSTAT CEN, SL C/ Cases de son Llaüt, 7 07320 Santa Maria, Illes Balears / ES | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/45] | For all designated states Global Cen Technologies, SL C/ Cases de son Llaut, 7 07320 Santa Maria / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOSCH ROS, David 08207 Sabadell / ES | 02 /
SANZ GÓMEZ, Álvaro 07007 Palma de Mallorca. / ES | 03 /
TORTOSA MONTOJO, Ignacio 07013 Palma de Mallorca / ES | 04 /
PALERM LLABRÉS, Antoni 07550 Son Servera / ES | 05 /
MARTÍ SAURAS, José Mª 07320 Binissalem / ES | 06 /
ESCALONA LORENZO, José Mariano 07008 Palma de Mallorca / ES | 07 /
MEDRANO GIL, Hipólito 07014 Palma de Mallorca / ES | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Torner, Juncosa I Associats, SL C / Pau Claris, 108, 1r 1a 08009 Barcelona / ES | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 22382436.8 | 06.05.2022 | [2023/45] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4273543 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/00, A01G7/00, G01N27/04 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
G01N33/0098 (EP);
A01G7/00 (EP);
G01N27/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] |
Former [2023/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEWERTUNG DES WASSERZUSTANDES EINER PFLANZE | [2023/45] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR THE EVALUATION OF THE HYDRIC STATE OF A PLANT | [2023/45] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR L'ÉVALUATION DE L'ÉTAT HYDRIQUE D'UNE INSTALLATION | [2023/45] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 27.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2007039537 (ROTFINDER AB [SE], et al); | [A]DE102006026557 (GRUNEWALD JOERG [DE]); | [A]EP3104135 (NAT UNIV CORP KAGAWA UNIV [JP]); | [A]CN114020065 (JIANGSU POLYTECHNIC COLLEGE AGRICULTURE & FORESTRY); | [A]WO2022039007 (UNIV KAGAWA NAT UNIV CORP [JP]) | by applicant | US9857391 | KR101996404B | CN111189885 | CN113418963 |