EP4290162 - DOMESTIC COOLING APPLIANCE COMPRISING A REINFORCEMENT PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | For all designated states BSH Electrodomésticos España, S.A. Avenida de la Industria 49 50016 Zaragoza / ES | [2023/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herrero Garcia, Sergio 31621 Sarriguren / ES | 02 /
Özsoy, Yalcin 89522 Heidenheim an der Brenz / DE | 03 /
Hosamani, Prashantagouda 89073 Ulm / DE | 04 /
Eckartsberg, Peter 73433 Aalen / DE | 05 /
Renner, Hans 89537 Giengen / DE | [2023/50] | Application number, filing date | 22382551.4 | 09.06.2022 | [2023/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4290162 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F25D29/00 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
F25D29/005 (EP);
F25D23/065 (EP);
F25D2400/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/30] |
Former [2023/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HAUSHALTSKÜHLGERÄT AUFWEISEND EIN VERSTÄRKUNGSTEIL | [2023/50] | English: | DOMESTIC COOLING APPLIANCE COMPRISING A REINFORCEMENT PART | [2023/50] | French: | APPAREIL DOMESTIQUE DE REFROIDISSEMENT AYANT UNE PIÈCE DE RENFORT | [2023/50] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2024 | Examination requested [2024/30] | 13.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]KR20020022306 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [I] 1-11 * abstract *; | [I]DE102006040374 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [I] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0030] - [0032] *; | [A]ES2355777 (BSH ELECTRODOMESTICOS ESPANA [ES]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]US2014030921 (KOBAYASHI MASAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]CN103673474B (TAIZHOU LG ELECT REFRIGERATOR) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2006223351 | EP2021708 |