EP4393457 - WOUND DRESSING FOR DETECTING AN INFECTION IN WOUND EXUDATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paul Hartmann AG Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2024/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gonzalez Gómez-Arevalillo, Fernando 08030 Basconia 69, Barcelona / ES | 02 /
Zúñiga Ruiz, Camilo Javier 08025 Barcelona / ES | 03 /
Yagüe, Jose Luis 08025 Barcelona / ES | 04 /
Ben-Aissa Soler, Alejandra 08302 Mataró, Barcelona / ES | 05 /
Moya Lara, Ana 08302 Mataró, Barcelona / ES | 06 /
Delgado Simao, Claudia Custodia 08014 Barcelona / ES | 07 /
Pozuelo Ruiz, Marta 43008 Tarragona / ES | 08 /
del Bas, Josep Maria 43007 Tarragona / ES | [2024/27] | Representative(s) | Paul Hartmann AG Patents & Licensing Paul-Hartmann-Straße 12 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2024/27] | Application number, filing date | 22383299.9 | 28.12.2022 | [2024/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4393457 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/00, A61F13/02 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
A61F13/00063 (EP);
A61F13/00059 (EP);
A61F13/00987 (EP);
A61F13/0226 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WUNDVERBAND ZUR ERKENNUNG EINER INFEKTION IN WUNDEXSUDAT | [2024/27] | English: | WOUND DRESSING FOR DETECTING AN INFECTION IN WOUND EXUDATE | [2024/27] | French: | PANSEMENT POUR LA DÉTECTION D'UNE INFECTION PAR UN EXSUDAT DE PLAIE | [2024/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CA2333107 (DELSYS PHARMACEUTICAL CORP [US]); | [A]US2014018654 (DRURY THOMAS J [US]); | [XI]US2021361490 (BURNET MICHAEL [DE], et al); | [A]US2022370000 (MEHROTRA ANJULI KUMAR [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2014011207 | EP3435941 |